RI H8323 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the state of Rhode Island to issue general obligation bonds in an amount not to exceed $10,000,000 for the state bikeway development program upon approval of a majority of the qualified electors voting on the proposition to issue these bonds.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of Bonds, Refunding Bonds, And Temporary Notes Of The State Of Not More Than $10,000,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor In Support Of The State Bikeway Development Program
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8323.pdf |