RI H8303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Newport to issue not more than $6,000,000 bonds for municipal facilities.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Newport To Finance The Design, Acquisition, Demolition, Construction, Repair, Rehabilitation, Improvement, Alteration, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Municipal Facilities For School, Recreation, Library And Other Public Uses By The Issuance Of Not More Than $6,000,000 Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |