RI H8298 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study R.i.g.l. 39-14.1, The Public Motor Vehicle Act, And The Impact Of Innovative Technologies On The Market For Transportation Services (this Resolution Creates An Eleven Member Commission To Study The Public Motor Vehicle Act, R.i.g.l. 39-41.1, And The Impact Of Technologies On The Market Of Transportation Services, And Who Reports Back On March 31, 2015 And Expires On May 31, 2015.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study R.i.g.l. 39-14.1, The Public Motor Vehicle Act, And The Impact Of Innovative Technologies On The Market For Transportation Services (this Resolution Creates An Eleven Member Commission To Study The Public Motor Vehicle Act, R.i.g.l. 39-41.1, And The Impact Of Technologies On The Market Of Transportation Services, And Who Reports Back On March 31, 2015 And Expires On May 31, 2015.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage approval of amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |