RI H8294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes courses that include instruction in career and technical education programs.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2022) |
2022-05-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |