RI H8271 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the need of filing an SR 22, standard form with the department of motor vehicles or its divisions, in order for an individual to get their operator’s license reinstated.
Title
Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Motor and other vehicles (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Motor and other vehicles (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-20 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |