RI H8269 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the state, general contractors, and construction managers from withholding more than five percent (5%) as a retainer with respect to any sewer, water main, or other public works construction contract.
Title
Contractors' Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8269.pdf |