RI H8250 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Gordon Fox [D] | Rep. Peter Kilmartin [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8250.pdf |