RI H8245 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Hospital Closure Transition Act which would facilitate the acquisition of a closed hospital's assets by an existing hospital by exempting the acquisition from the hospital conversions and health care facilities licensing acts.
Title
Hospital Closure Transition Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8245.pdf |