RI H8234 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Travel Insurance Act" to establish a comprehensive and uniform regulatory framework to clarify current applicable law applicable to travel insurance policies.
Title
Travel Insurance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8234.pdf |