RI H8231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-18 - Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-18 - Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the provisions of the general laws pertaining to parole, medical parole, community confinement, and replaces prison impact statements with correctional impact statements.
Title
Correctional Institutions - Parole, Medical Parole, Community Confinement, And Correctional Impacts
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016) |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8231.pdf |