RI H8223 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Actual And Potential Effects Of Ocean Acidification On Rhode Island
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Actual And Potential Effects Of Ocean Acidification On Rhode Island
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |