RI H8220 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To Incorporate The Wesquage Community District
Title
To Incorporate The Wesquage Community District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |