RI H8210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Curtis Clyde Greco to join Christine Kay Bean and Paul Michael Greco Kotuby in marriage on or about July 31, 2016, within the Town of Bristol, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-31 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |