RI H8172 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Pascoag Utility District (would Allow The Pascoag Utility District To Produce, Purchase, Acquire, Distribute And Sell Electricity At Wholesale Or Retail Within Or Without Its Utility Service Area.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Pascoag Utility District (would Allow The Pascoag Utility District To Produce, Purchase, Acquire, Distribute And Sell Electricity At Wholesale Or Retail Within Or Without Its Utility Service Area.)
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8172.pdf |