RI H8171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $3,000,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds To The Central Coventry Fire District To Ensure The Continued Delivery Of Fire Suppression And Ems Services And To Transform The District From Its Existing 3-platoon Staffing Model To A 4-platoon Model (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $3,000,000 To The Central Coventry Fire District To Ensure The Continued Delivery Of Fire Suppression And Ems Services And The Transformation To A 4-platoon Staffing Model.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $3,000,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds To The Central Coventry Fire District To Ensure The Continued Delivery Of Fire Suppression And Ems Services And To Transform The District From Its Existing 3-platoon Staffing Model To A 4-platoon Model (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $3,000,000 To The Central Coventry Fire District To Ensure The Continued Delivery Of Fire Suppression And Ems Services And The Transformation To A 4-platoon Staffing Model.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8171.pdf |