RI H8163 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the department of human services to use low-income energy assistance funds throughout the calendar year, establish an arrearage program and require the PUC to conduct a review of programs impacting low-income ratepayers.
Title
Duties And Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Meeting postponed (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |