RI H8152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes North Providence to issue bonds and notes not exceeding $75,000,000 for construction, renovating, equipping of schools upon approval of its electors.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of North Providence To Issue Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not Exceeding $75,000,000 To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, Repair, Improvements, Furnishing And Equipping Of And/or Additions To Schools And School Facilities In The Town Including, But Not Limited To, The Construction Of Two New Elementary Schools And Health And Safety Improvements To Elementary Schools, Middle Schools And The High School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |