RI H8151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school committee/governing body of charter/private school to notify RIDE of athletic coaches/trainers terminated for cause with RIDE required to maintain/allow access to non-public record list by hiring authority for any school.
Title
Athletic Coaches
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8151.pdf |