RI H8150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Underground storage tanks installed prior to May 8, 1988 are permitted to remain in use until December 22, 2020. Five (5) members of the Underground Storage Tank Review Board constitutes a quorum.
Title
Relating To Waters And Navigation
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |