RI H8118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that no fee or surcharge, other than the fees and charges authorized pursuant to ยง 39-18.1-4, be added to any motor vehicle registration as a result of the issuance of any new registration plate.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8118.pdf |