RI H8102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits emergency mail ballot applications to be processed at voter's board of canvassers in person on electronic poll pads allowing the voter to then cast his or her ballot and place the ballot in the state-approved voting machine.
Title
Mail Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-07-13 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/14/2020) |
2020-07-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |