RI H8042 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require health insurance coverage for drugs which treat opioid substance use and addictions. Also requires special discharge plans be developed for patients treated for substance use.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Use Disorders
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2014-05-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |