RI H8013 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes possession of a used catalytic converter a felony and requires recycling service providers to maintain certain records relative to catalytic converters.
Title
Theft, Embezzlement, False Pretenses, And Misappropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8013.pdf |