RI H8011 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a school nurse-teacher and school nurse's designee to possess and administer properly authorized medical marijuana to a student at school.
Title
Health Care Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8011.pdf |