RI H8003 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $10,000,000 To The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc) (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $10,000,000 To The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF $10,000,000 TO THE RHODE ISLAND COASTAL RESOURCES MANAGEMENT COUNCIL (CRMC) (This resolution would authorize the appropriation of the sum of $10,000,000 to the Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8003.pdf |