RI H7999 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Upon defendant's violation of terms of bail, the amount forfeited by court is limited to 10% of surety deposited. Bondsperson has extra time to return fugitive before further forfeiture. If fugitive isn't returned, there is forfeiture.
Title
Bail And Recognizance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-31 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |