RI H7994 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- MOTION PICTURE PRODUCTION TAX CREDITS - Increase the motion picture tax credit to $10,000,000 and then to $15,000,000 for 2026 and the total available credits to $40,000,000 for 2025 and $50,000,000 for 2026 and eliminates the sunset provision. Effective 1/1/2025.
Title
Increase the motion picture tax credit to $10,000,000 and then to $15,000,000 for 2026 and the total available credits to $40,000,000 for 2025 and $50,000,000 for 2026 and eliminates the sunset provision. Effective 1/1/2025.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7994.pdf |