RI H7975 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds To The City Of Central Falls In Recognition Of The Disproportionately High Impact Of The Pandemic On Central Falls And The Disproportionately Arpa Funding To The City (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To The City Of Central Falls For Relief In Combating Pandemic Threats To The City's Public Health.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 From The American Rescue Plan Act Funds To The City Of Central Falls In Recognition Of The Disproportionately High Impact Of The Pandemic On Central Falls And The Disproportionately Arpa Funding To The City (this Joint Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To The City Of Central Falls For Relief In Combating Pandemic Threats To The City's Public Health.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7975.pdf |