RI H7966 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the section which created the commercial fishing license review board.
Title
Commercial Fishing License Review Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2016) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2016-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2016) |
2016-03-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |