RI H7952 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS -- ARBITRATION - Spells out additional notice provisions, fees and costs of the arbitration process, from initiation to default provisions and potential court sanctions for breach of the arbitration agreement.
Title
Spells out additional notice provisions, fees and costs of the arbitration process, from initiation to default provisions and potential court sanctions for breach of the arbitration agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS -- ARBITRATION
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS -- ARBITRATION
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7952.pdf |