RI H7936 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize utilization review agent to determine whether to authorize/certify emergency inpatient admissions or admission for residential crisis service treatment of a mental, emotional, or substance abuse disorder.
Title
Health Care Services - Utilization Review Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |