RI H7907 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the corner of 496 Main Street and Joyce Street along state route 114 in the town of Warren, Rhode Island, would be known as Delekta’s Corner.
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |