RI H7894 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all property owners of rental property to file with the secretary of state notice of their name, home address, including zip code, and telephone number. The secretary of state shall comply a report of such information.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7894.pdf |