RI H7890 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of the term "commission" for purposes of the historic residence tax credit to mean the local historic district commission created by the city or town council, and not the state historical preservation and heritage commission.
Title
Historic Residence--tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7890.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7890A.pdf |