RI H7884 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- RHODE ISLAND'S CHILDREN DESERVE HELP NOT HARM ACT -- MINOR'S GENDER TRANSITION - Prohibits gender transition procedures for all minors, uses of public funds for that purpose, discipline for health care providers for providing same, a thirty (30) year statute of limitation, right to a civil action for damages.
Title
Prohibits gender transition procedures for all minors, uses of public funds for that purpose, discipline for health care providers for providing same, a thirty (30) year statute of limitation, right to a civil action for damages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Health And Safety
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- RHODE ISLAND'S CHILDREN DESERVE HELP NOT HARM ACT
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- RHODE ISLAND'S CHILDREN DESERVE HELP NOT HARM ACT -- MINOR'S GENDER TRANSITION
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- RHODE ISLAND'S CHILDREN DESERVE HELP NOT HARM ACT
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- RHODE ISLAND'S CHILDREN DESERVE HELP NOT HARM ACT -- MINOR'S GENDER TRANSITION
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7884.pdf |