RI H7865 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/02/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/02/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a new and separate calendar within the Superior Court to expediently hear and decide land use matters.
Title
Superior Court--land Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/02/2014) |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7865.pdf |