RI H7827 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island global warming solutions act to reduce carbon emissions across various sectors of the local economy.
Title
Rhode Island Global Warming Solutions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2018) |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7827.pdf |