RI H7819 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the "Green Buildings Act" to include public projects and updates the standards to include LEED for Neighborhood Development, and SITES.
Title
The Green Buildings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7819.pdf |