RI H7809 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- VEGETATION PLANNING AND MAINTENANCE ACT - Establishes the Vegetation Planning and Management Act to provide guidelines for utilities to manage and maintain vegetation near power lines.
Title
Establishes the Vegetation Planning and Management Act to provide guidelines for utilities to manage and maintain vegetation near power lines.
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Jennifer Boylan [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Megan Cotter [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- VEGETATION PLANNING AND MAINTENANCE ACT
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- VEGETATION PLANNING AND MAINTENANCE ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7809.pdf |