RI H7803 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for special legislative funding to the department of health to support the state's environmental lead program.
Title
Lead Poisoning Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7803.pdf |