RI H7801 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines incidental operation upon a highway for exempted farm vehicles and requires them to display "Slow Moving Vehicle" emblem when so engaged.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |