RI H7794 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decreases an employee's obligation for contribution from wages and requires an employer to contribute one-half of the amount to an employee's contribution.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance -- Contributions
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7794.pdf |