RI H7791 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes town of Coventry to enact ordinance granting $1,000 exemption to person who was member of National Guard for not less than 5 consecutive years or served in National Guard and called to active duty by President.
Title
Veterans' Property Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018) |
2018-04-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-04-02 | House | Meeting postponed (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7791.pdf |