RI H7787 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the general treasurer submit an annual report regarding federal old-age and survivors' insurance to the general assembly.
Title
Federal Old-age And Survivors' Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-05-04 | House | House read and passed |
2016-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2016) |
2016-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |