RI H7760 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no state or federal funds be used for induced abortions except where the life of the mother is endangered or the pregnancy is result of rape or incest.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Karen Macbeth [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-11 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7760.pdf |