RI H7755 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact that would regulate the practice of telepsychology (psychological services using a form of telecommunications) by psychologists across state boundaries.
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7755.pdf |