RI H7743 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides guidelines for the delegation by licensed health care professionals of non-ablative laser or energy-based treatments to a properly-qualified delegate.
Title
Delegation Of Non-ablative Treatments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2016) |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7743.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7743A.pdf |