RI H7737 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the office of diversity, equity and opportunity (ODEO) to create, and for all state and municipal employees to receive, annual training in cultural competency. Defines "cultural competency".
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Steven Lima [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-27 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |