RI H7735 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the practice of aiding a minor in the process of getting an abortion a civil and criminal offense.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7735.pdf |