RI H7730 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- BIRDS - Allows the taking of wild turkeys by using a crossbow in compliance with rules and regulations promulgated by DEM.
Title
Allows the taking of wild turkeys by using a crossbow in compliance with rules and regulations promulgated by DEM.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-29 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2024) |
2024-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |